Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/04/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/14/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 03/14/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 04/15/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/17/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/24/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 08/01/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 08/02/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 02/04/2014
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 02/04/2014
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 02/27/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/04/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/04/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 03/26/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/26/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 03/26/2014
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/02/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 04/02/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 04/10/2014
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/29/2014
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 04/29/2014
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 04/29/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 06/09/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/09/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 06/24/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 06/24/2014
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 06/24/2014
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 07/08/2014
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 07/08/2014
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 07/08/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/09/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 07/16/2014
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 07/24/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 07/30/2014
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 07/31/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 09/15/2014