Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 07/23/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/18/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/18/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/18/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 09/18/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/26/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 10/16/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/26/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 12/02/2014