There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Perpetual POW/MIA Stamp Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the issuance of a forever stamp to honor the sacrifices of the brave men and women of the Armed Forces who are still prisoner, missing, or unaccounted for, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/23/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
07/23/2013Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/23/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (52)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13]* 07/23/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 07/26/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/26/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 07/26/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 07/26/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 07/26/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 07/26/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/26/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/26/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 07/26/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 07/26/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/26/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 07/26/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 07/26/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 07/26/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 07/26/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 07/26/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/26/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 07/26/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 07/26/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 07/26/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 07/26/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 07/26/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 07/26/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 07/26/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 07/26/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/26/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 07/26/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/26/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 07/26/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/26/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 07/26/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 07/26/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 07/26/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 07/30/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 07/30/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/31/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/31/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/31/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/19/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 09/25/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/09/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 02/26/2014
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/25/2014
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 04/28/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/07/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 09/08/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 09/08/2014
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 09/11/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 09/17/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 11/18/2014
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 11/19/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform07/23/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2794. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/23/2013)

Perpetual POW/MIA Stamp Act - Directs the Postmaster General to provide for the issuance of a forever stamp that honors the sacrifices of the members of the Armed Forces who have been prisoners, missing, or unaccounted for and that depicts the National League of Families POW/MIA flag.