Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13]* 07/23/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 07/26/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/26/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 07/26/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 07/26/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 07/26/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 07/26/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/26/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/26/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 07/26/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 07/26/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/26/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 07/26/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 07/26/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 07/26/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 07/26/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 07/26/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/26/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 07/26/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 07/26/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 07/26/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 07/26/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 07/26/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 07/26/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 07/26/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 07/26/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/26/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 07/26/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/26/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 07/26/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/26/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 07/26/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 07/26/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 07/26/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 07/30/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 07/30/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/31/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/31/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/31/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/19/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 09/25/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/09/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 02/26/2014
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/25/2014
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 04/28/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/07/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 09/08/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 09/08/2014
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 09/11/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 09/17/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 11/18/2014
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 11/19/2014