Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13]* 07/23/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 07/26/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 07/26/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/26/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/26/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 07/26/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 07/26/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 07/26/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 07/26/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/26/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 07/30/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 04/28/2014
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 09/11/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 09/17/2014