Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 01/23/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/23/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/23/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 01/23/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 01/23/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 02/06/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 02/06/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 02/14/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/21/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/30/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/31/2013