Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 07/23/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 09/11/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 10/01/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/21/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 01/13/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 04/28/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 04/28/2014
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 04/28/2014