Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 07/25/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 07/26/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 07/31/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 10/30/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 03/12/2014