Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/25/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/25/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 07/25/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/25/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/25/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 07/25/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/25/2013
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 07/25/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/25/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/25/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 07/25/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 07/25/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 07/30/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/30/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 07/30/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/31/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 07/31/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 07/31/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 07/31/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 08/01/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 08/02/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/09/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 09/09/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 09/09/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 09/09/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 09/18/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 10/28/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 11/13/2013
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 11/15/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 11/21/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 11/21/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/08/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/09/2014
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/10/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 04/10/2014