Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 10/16/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/26/2014
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/19/2014
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 05/28/2014