Refine your search

Refined by:

Michigan Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 12/12/2013
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/20/2014
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 05/29/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/02/2014