Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 01/07/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 01/14/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 03/21/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 04/28/2014
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/20/2014