Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 11/13/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 11/13/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/15/2013
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 11/21/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 12/02/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 01/14/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/05/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/26/2014
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/07/2014
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/28/2014
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/08/2014
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/19/2014
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/20/2014