Refine your search

Refined by:

Washington Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 11/15/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 12/02/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 12/12/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 04/04/2014
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/20/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/23/2014