Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 09/12/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 09/18/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/18/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/20/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 09/25/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 09/25/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 09/27/2013