Refine your search

Refined by:

Georgia Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/12/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 09/18/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 09/25/2013
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 09/25/2013