Refine your search

Refined by:

Missouri Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 09/12/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 09/18/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/19/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 09/20/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 09/26/2013