Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 08/02/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 09/18/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 09/19/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/20/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 09/25/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/26/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/27/2013