Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 07/30/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 07/30/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/30/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/30/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 07/30/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/30/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/30/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 07/30/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 07/30/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 07/30/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 07/30/2013
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 07/30/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/30/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/30/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/30/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/30/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 07/30/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/31/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/31/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/31/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/31/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/31/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/31/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/31/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 07/31/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/31/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 08/01/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 08/01/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 08/01/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 08/02/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 08/02/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 08/02/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 09/18/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 09/18/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 10/11/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 10/15/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 10/23/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 10/28/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 10/29/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 10/30/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 11/15/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 11/15/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 11/21/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 12/09/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/09/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 12/09/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 12/12/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 12/12/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 01/08/2014