Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 10/10/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 10/10/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 10/10/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 10/10/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/16/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/23/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 11/19/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/21/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 12/03/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 02/26/2014