Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 02/04/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 02/04/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 02/04/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 02/06/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 02/06/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 02/06/2013
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 02/12/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 02/12/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 02/13/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 02/13/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/13/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 02/13/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/13/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/13/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 02/13/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/13/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 02/13/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 02/25/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/25/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 03/04/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 03/12/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 03/12/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/12/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 03/12/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/12/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 03/14/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/11/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 06/26/2013
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/26/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 07/11/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 07/22/2013