Refine your search

Refined by:

Massachusetts Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 07/25/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/30/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 09/10/2013
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 03/26/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/30/2014