Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 05/06/2014
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/30/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 06/24/2014
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 07/07/2014
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/08/2014