Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 08/01/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 09/12/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/25/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 11/12/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/09/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 12/10/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 01/13/2014
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 01/14/2014
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 01/15/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/10/2014
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/25/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/09/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/10/2014
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/19/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/11/2014
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/14/2014
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/14/2014
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 07/17/2014
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 07/25/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 07/28/2014
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/28/2014
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/29/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/30/2014
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 07/30/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 08/01/2014
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 09/10/2014
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/18/2014