Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 07/25/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 07/30/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 07/30/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 07/30/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 07/30/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/30/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/30/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 07/31/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 07/31/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 08/01/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 08/02/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 08/02/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 08/02/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 08/02/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/09/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 09/17/2013