Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 09/17/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/18/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 09/18/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 09/19/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 09/25/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 09/25/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/25/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 09/30/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 10/23/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/12/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 11/12/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 11/12/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 12/10/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 01/08/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 01/10/2014
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 01/10/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 01/16/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 01/16/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 01/16/2014
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 01/29/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 02/04/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/04/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 02/04/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 02/06/2014
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 02/06/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 02/10/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/10/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/10/2014
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 02/25/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/25/2014
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 02/25/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 02/26/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 02/26/2014
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/26/2014
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/26/2014
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 03/14/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/26/2014
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 03/26/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/26/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/26/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 04/03/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 04/03/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/03/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 04/28/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/28/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 05/07/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 05/07/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/07/2014
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/07/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/07/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/09/2014
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 05/19/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 05/19/2014
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 05/22/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 05/22/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 06/24/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 06/24/2014
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 07/30/2014
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 09/16/2014