There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Federal Communications Commission Consolidated Reporting Act of 2013

Short Titles as Reported to House

Federal Communications Commission Consolidated Reporting Act of 2013

Short Titles as Introduced

Federal Communications Commission Consolidated Reporting Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Communications Act of 1934 to consolidate the reporting obligations of the Federal Communications Commission in order to improve congressional oversight and reduce reporting burdens.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/09/2013Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 415 - 0 (Roll no. 449).(text: CR H5414-5415)
09/09/2013Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 113-189.
07/26/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
09/10/2013SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
09/09/2013-7:26pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 415 - 0 (Roll no. 449). (text: CR H5414-5415)
09/09/2013-7:13pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5417-5418)
09/09/2013-4:24pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
09/09/2013-4:14pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2844.
09/09/2013-4:14pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5414-5416)
09/09/2013-4:14pmHouseMr. Scalise moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/09/2013HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 136.
09/09/2013HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 113-189.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/31/2013HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/31/2013HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/30/2013HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/26/2013HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/26/2013HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
07/26/2013HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 07/26/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 07/26/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 07/30/2013

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce07/26/2013 Referred to
07/31/2013 Markup by
09/09/2013 Reported by H. Rept. 113-189
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Communications and Technology07/26/2013 Referred to
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation09/10/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2844. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/09/2013)

Federal Communications Commission Consolidated Reporting Act of 2013 - (Sec. 2) Amends the Communications Act of 1934 to require the Federal Communications Commission (FCC) to publish on its website and submit to Congress a biennial report on the state of the communications marketplace assessing: (1) competition, including intermodal, facilities-based, and new and emergent services competition and addressing the provision of content, as well as communications using the Internet; (2) deployment of communications capabilities, including whether advanced telecommunications capability is being deployed to all Americans in a reasonable and timely fashion; and (3) whether laws, regulations, or regulatory practices pose a barrier to competitive entry or expansion of existing providers of communications services.

Requires the FCC to: (1) compile a list of geographic areas that are not served by any provider of advanced telecommunications capability; and (2) consider market entry barriers for entrepreneurs and other small businesses in the communications marketplace in accordance with existing national policy favoring diversity of media voices, vigorous economic competition, technological advancement, and promotion of the public interest, convenience, and necessity.

(Sec. 3) Repeals and consolidates various FCC reports including reports on satellite competition, international broadband, video programming, cable industry prices, small business entry barriers, commercial mobile radio, waivers from requirements prohibiting FCC employees from being financially interested in companies subject to FCC regulation, and several other existing reports under such Act.