Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 07/30/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 09/09/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/09/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/09/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 09/09/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/09/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 10/16/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 11/15/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 12/05/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 12/05/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 12/12/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/07/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/16/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 02/03/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/03/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 02/06/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 02/10/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 02/25/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 02/25/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/25/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 02/27/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/04/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/04/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/06/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 03/06/2014
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/26/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/03/2014
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/29/2014
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 04/29/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 07/14/2014
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 07/14/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/14/2014
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/16/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/16/2014
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 07/24/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/29/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/29/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 07/29/2014
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 07/29/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 08/01/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 08/01/2014
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 09/09/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 09/09/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/16/2014
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/18/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 11/18/2014
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 11/18/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 11/18/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 11/18/2014
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 11/20/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 11/20/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/20/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 11/20/2014
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 12/12/2014