Refine your search

Showing 14 of 14 total for All Actions.
Date Chamber All Actions
09/30/2013 Senate Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: Senate
09/29/2013-12:30am House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 384 - 37 (Roll no. 500). (text: CR 9/28/2013 H5965-5971)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/29/2013-12:24am House Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR 9/28/2013 H6010)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/28/2013-3:15pm House At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/28/2013-2:35pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2848.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/28/2013-2:35pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5965-6075)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/28/2013-2:35pm House Mr. Royce moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/25/2013 House Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 166.
Type of Action: Calendars
Action By: House of Representatives
09/25/2013 House Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Foreign Affairs. H. Rept. 113-226.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Foreign Affairs
08/01/2013 House Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Foreign Affairs
08/01/2013 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Foreign Affairs
07/30/2013 House Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives
07/30/2013 House Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives
07/30/2013 House Introduced in House
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives