There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

End Racial Profiling Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To eliminate racial profiling by law enforcement, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/30/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
09/13/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/30/2013Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/30/2013Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1158-1159)
Action By: House of Representatives
07/30/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (61)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 07/30/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/30/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 08/01/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 08/01/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 08/01/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 08/01/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 08/01/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 08/02/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 10/23/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 10/23/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 12/19/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/19/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 12/19/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 12/19/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 12/19/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 12/19/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 12/19/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 09/18/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 09/18/2014
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 11/13/2014
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 11/13/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 11/14/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 12/04/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 12/04/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary07/30/2013 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations09/13/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2851. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/30/2013)

End Racial Profiling Act of 2013 - Prohibits any law enforcement agent or agency from engaging in racial profiling. Defines "racial profiling" to mean the practice of a law enforcement agent or agency relying, to any degree, on race, ethnicity, national origin, gender, or religion in selecting which individual to subject to routine or spontaneous investigatory activities, or in deciding upon the scope and substance of law enforcement activity following the initial investigatory activity, except when there is trustworthy information relevant to the locality and timeframe that links a person of a particular race, ethnicity, national origin, gender, or religion to an identified criminal incident or scheme.

Authorizes the United States or an individual injured by racial profiling to enforce this Act in a civil action for declaratory or injunctive relief.

Requires: (1) federal law enforcement agencies to maintain adequate policies and procedures to eliminate racial profiling and to cease existing practices that permit racial profiling; and (2) state or local governmental entities or state, local, or tribal law enforcement agencies that apply for grants under the Edward Byrne Memorial Justice Assistance Grant Program and the Cops on the Beat Program to certify that they maintain adequate policies and procedures for eliminating racial profiling and have eliminated any existing practices that permit or encourage racial profiling.

Requires the Attorney General to issue regulations to ensure that administrative complaint procedures and independent audit programs provide an appropriate response to allegations of racial profiling by law enforcement agents or agencies.

Authorizes the Attorney General to award grants and contracts for the collection of data relating to racial profiling and for the development of best practices and systems to eliminate racial profiling. Requires: (1) the Attorney General to issue regulations for the collection and compilation of data on racial profiling, and (2) the Department of Justice Bureau of Justice Statistics to analyze the data collected for any statistically significant disparities.

Requires the Attorney General to submit annual reports on racial profiling by law enforcement agencies.