Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 08/02/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 09/18/2014
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 11/13/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 11/14/2014