Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 07/30/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/10/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 09/10/2013
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 01/16/2014
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 02/26/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 02/27/2014