Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 09/17/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 10/08/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 10/16/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/22/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 12/19/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 01/07/2014
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/28/2014
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/28/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/28/2014
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 05/28/2014
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/19/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 07/08/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 07/08/2014
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 07/08/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 07/08/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/09/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/09/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 07/09/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 07/09/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/09/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/22/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/22/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 07/22/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 07/22/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 07/22/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 07/23/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 07/23/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/23/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 07/23/2014
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 07/23/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 07/23/2014
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/23/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/23/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 07/23/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/23/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 07/23/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 07/23/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/23/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 07/24/2014
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/28/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 07/28/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/28/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 07/28/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/28/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 07/28/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 07/28/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 07/28/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/28/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/28/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/28/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/28/2014
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 07/28/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/28/2014
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 07/28/2014
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/28/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 07/28/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/28/2014
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 07/28/2014
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 07/28/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 07/28/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/28/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 07/31/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/31/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 07/31/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 07/31/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 07/31/2014
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/31/2014
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 07/31/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 07/31/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 07/31/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 08/01/2014
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 08/01/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 08/01/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 08/01/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 08/01/2014
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 08/01/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 09/08/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/08/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 09/08/2014
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 09/08/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 09/08/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/09/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 09/09/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/09/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/09/2014
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 09/09/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 09/09/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 09/09/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 09/09/2014
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 09/11/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 09/11/2014
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/16/2014
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 09/16/2014
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 09/16/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 09/16/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/16/2014
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 09/16/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/16/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 09/16/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 09/16/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 09/16/2014
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/16/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 09/16/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 09/16/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 09/16/2014
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 09/16/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 09/16/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/16/2014
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 09/16/2014
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 09/16/2014
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/16/2014
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 09/16/2014
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/16/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/16/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 09/18/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/18/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 09/18/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/18/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 09/18/2014
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 09/18/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 09/18/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 09/18/2014
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 09/18/2014
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/18/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/18/2014
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 09/18/2014
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 09/18/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/18/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/18/2014
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 09/18/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 11/12/2014
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 11/12/2014
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 11/12/2014
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 11/12/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 11/12/2014
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 11/12/2014
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 11/12/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 11/12/2014
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 11/12/2014
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 11/12/2014
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 11/12/2014
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 11/12/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 11/12/2014
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 11/14/2014
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/04/2014
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 12/09/2014
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 12/09/2014
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 12/09/2014