Refine your search

Refined by:

Georgia Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/29/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 10/29/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 11/12/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 11/12/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 11/13/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 11/13/2013
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 11/14/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 12/11/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 12/11/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 12/11/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/14/2014