Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 10/29/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 11/12/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 11/12/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 11/12/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 11/13/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 11/20/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/11/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/11/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 12/11/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/11/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 12/11/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 02/14/2014