Refine your search

Refined by:

Kentucky Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 10/29/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 11/20/2013
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 12/11/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 02/14/2014