Refine your search

Refined by:

Michigan Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 10/29/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 11/12/2013
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 11/14/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 12/11/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 12/19/2013