Refine your search

Refined by:

New Jersey Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/22/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 11/12/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 11/12/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 11/12/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 11/12/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 11/13/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/20/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 12/11/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 01/27/2014