Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 09/25/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 09/30/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 10/23/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 10/29/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 11/12/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 11/13/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 11/13/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/13/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 11/13/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 11/13/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 11/13/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 11/14/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 11/14/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 11/14/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/20/2013