Refine your search

Refined by:

North Carolina Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/03/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/16/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 10/29/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 11/13/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 02/14/2014
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/14/2014