Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 10/04/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 10/29/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 11/12/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 11/12/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 11/12/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 11/12/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 11/12/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 11/13/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 11/13/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/13/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 11/14/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 11/14/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 11/14/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 12/11/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 02/14/2014