Refine your search

Refined by:

Tennessee Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/29/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 11/14/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 12/10/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 12/11/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/14/2014
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 02/14/2014
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 02/14/2014