Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 09/25/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 09/30/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 09/30/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/30/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/04/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/16/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/22/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 10/22/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 10/23/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 10/23/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/23/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 10/23/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 10/28/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 10/28/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/29/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/12/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/12/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 11/12/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/12/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 11/12/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 11/12/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 11/12/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 11/12/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 11/13/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 11/13/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 11/13/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 11/13/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 11/13/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 11/13/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 11/13/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 11/13/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/13/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 11/13/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 11/13/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 11/13/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 11/13/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 11/13/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 11/13/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 11/13/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/13/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/13/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 11/13/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 11/13/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 11/13/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 11/13/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 11/13/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 11/13/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 11/14/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 11/14/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 11/14/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 11/14/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 11/14/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 11/14/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 11/14/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 11/14/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/20/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 11/20/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 11/20/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 11/20/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/20/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 11/20/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 11/20/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 11/20/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 11/21/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 12/09/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 12/09/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/09/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 12/10/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 12/10/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 12/11/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 12/11/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/11/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 12/11/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 12/11/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 12/11/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/11/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 12/11/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 12/11/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 12/11/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 12/11/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 12/11/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/11/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 12/11/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 12/11/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 12/16/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 12/16/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 12/16/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 01/07/2014
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 01/07/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 01/27/2014
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 01/27/2014
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 02/14/2014
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 02/14/2014
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/14/2014