Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 07/31/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 08/01/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 02/14/2014
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/08/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 08/01/2014
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/09/2014