Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 07/31/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 07/31/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/31/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 07/31/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 07/31/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 07/31/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 07/31/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 07/31/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 07/31/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 07/31/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 07/31/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 07/31/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 07/31/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 08/02/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/06/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/06/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 09/11/2013
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 09/17/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 09/17/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 09/17/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 09/25/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 10/08/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 10/28/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 01/15/2014
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 01/15/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 02/11/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/18/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/18/2014
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/12/2014
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 03/24/2014
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 03/24/2014
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 03/28/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 04/03/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/03/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 04/03/2014
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/03/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 04/03/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/03/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/04/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 04/04/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 04/08/2014
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 04/08/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 04/08/2014
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/08/2014
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 04/08/2014
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 04/08/2014
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 04/08/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 04/08/2014
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 04/10/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 04/10/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 04/28/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 04/28/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 04/28/2014
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 05/01/2014
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 05/06/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 05/06/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 05/06/2014
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 05/08/2014
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 05/22/2014
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 07/09/2014
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 07/30/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 07/31/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 07/31/2014
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 07/31/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 08/01/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 08/01/2014
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 08/01/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 09/11/2014