Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 07/31/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 07/31/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 07/31/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 07/31/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 07/31/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 07/31/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 07/31/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 08/02/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 08/02/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 09/12/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/12/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 09/12/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 02/05/2014
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/09/2014