Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 02/12/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/12/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/15/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 03/06/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 03/06/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 03/12/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/09/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 05/06/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/09/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/03/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 06/03/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/05/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/10/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/10/2014