Refine your search

7 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
12/19/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-289.
12/19/2014 Signed by President.
12/18/2014 Presented to President.
12/15/2014 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S6867)
12/08/2014 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
12/08/2014 Committee on Foreign Affairs discharged.
08/01/2013 Introduced in House