Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/27/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 04/08/2014
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 05/07/2014
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/16/2014
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/16/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/16/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/31/2014
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 07/31/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/18/2014
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 11/17/2014