Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 08/01/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/09/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/12/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 09/19/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 09/27/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 06/17/2014